+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 123)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
- §11 - 13BB- 1 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13BB- 2 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13BB- 3 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13BB- 4 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13BB- 5 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13BB- 6 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13BB- 7 - (New Code)
- §38 - 8 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 13DD- 1 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13DD- 2 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13DD- 3 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13DD- 4 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13DD- 5 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13DD- 6 - (New Code)
- §11 - 13DD- 7 - (New Code)
- §17 F- 1 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §17 F- 1 - 9 - (Amended Code)