+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Do pass, but first to Finance
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
- To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance
- Introduced in House
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 47)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Military
- Introduced in Senate
- To Military then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 9 - 11 - 1 - (New Code)
- § 9 - 11 - 2 - (New Code)