+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 2/25/16 - Senate Journal #15
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/25/16 - House Journal #785
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 2/25/16
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/19/16 - Senate Journal #4
On February 20, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 2/19/16 - House Journal #597
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/19/16
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 121)
- Completed legislative action
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 83)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 26)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §55 - 7 - 30 - (New Code)
- §18 - 5 - 4 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 2016: Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 121)
February 16, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 83)
February 1, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 26)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor