+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 243, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/24/16
- Approved by Governor 3/24/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal #16
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Conference report received-House
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 501)
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 621)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Conference report filed - House
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed - Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- To conference
- Communicated to House
- Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Carmichael, Ashley, Kessler
- House Message received
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House appointed conferees: Hanshaw, Ireland, Byrd
- House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
- House received Senate message
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
- Communicated to House
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 356)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §17 C- 12 - 7 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2016: House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 621)
March 12, 2016: Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 501)
March 4, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 356)
January 26, 2016: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor