+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- To House Education
- To Education then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 124)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Takubo Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Palumbo Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Romano Floor amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 2 - 25 b - (New Code)
+ − Vote
February 17, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 124)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor