+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/11/16 - House Journal #0
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/11/16
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 303)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 358)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 5)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- § 7 - 4 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 29 - 12 - (New Code)
- §55 - 7 - 13 - (Repealed Code)
- §55 - 7 - 13 a - (New Code)
- §55 - 7 - 13 b - (New Code)
- §55 - 7 - 13 c - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 358)
January 26, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 5)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor