+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as result of veto (Roll No. 382)
- Vetoed by Governor 3/9/16 - Senate Journal #45
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor 3/9/16 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate reconsidered action (voice vote)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Motion to consider notwithstanding the objections of the Governor
- House passed over veto (Roll No. 480)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 3/9/16
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/3/16 - House Journal #959
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/3/16
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
- House Message received
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 253)
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment rejected (Roll No. 252)
- Amendment reported by the Clerk
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 230)
On February 27, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Amendments pending
- Read 2nd time
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
- Plymale and Stollings Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 122)
- Ordered to House
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- §61 - 2 - 31 - (New Code)
- §23 - 4 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 2 P- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 20 - 1 - (New Code)
- §16 - 2 O- 1 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 2016: House passed over veto (Roll No. 480)
March 10, 2016: Senate passed as result of veto (Roll No. 382)
February 29, 2016: Amendment rejected (Roll No. 252)
February 29, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 253)
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 230)
February 17, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 122)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor