+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 142, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Vetoed by Governor 2/11/16 - Senate Journal #3
- Senate reconsidered action (voice vote)
- Senate passed as result of veto (Roll No. 87)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor 2/11/16 - House Journal #0
- House received Senate message
- Completed legislative action
- Motion to consider bill notwithstanding the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 67)
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House passed over veto (Roll No. 68)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 2/11/16
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 2/8/16 - House Journal #303
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/8/16 - Senate Journal #3
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/8/16
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 54)
- Motion to recommit to Judiciary rejected (Roll No. 53)
- House Message received
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 29)
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment reported by the Clerk
- Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Ordered to House
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 2)
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- §21 - 1 A- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §21 - 1 A- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §21 - 5 G- 1 - (New Code)
- §21 - 5 G- 2 - (New Code)
- §21 - 5 G- 3 - (New Code)
- §21 - 5 G- 4 - (New Code)
- §21 - 5 G- 5 - (New Code)
- §21 - 5 G- 6 - (New Code)
- §21 - 5 G- 7 - (New Code)
- §21 - 5 G- 8 - (New Code)
- §11 - 21 - 12 - (Amended Code)