+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 14, 2015 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- On Unfinished Business
- Completed legislative action
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported be adopted
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Reported by the Clerk
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Be adopted
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- To House Rules
- By substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- To House Roads and Transportation
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Rules
- Filed for introduction