+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
- Reported by the Clerk
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment reported by the Clerk
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Communicated to Senate
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- With amendment, be adopted
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- To House Rules
- By substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- To House Roads and Transportation
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Rules
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor