+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- House Message received
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Be adopted
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- To House Rules
- By substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- To House Technology and Infrastructure
- Introduced in House
- To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
- Filed for introduction