+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Voice vote)
- House received Senate message
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted, with amendments
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Be adopted
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- Filed for introduction