+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Rules
- Reported be adopted, but first to Rules
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education then Rules
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
- Reported by the Clerk
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Be adopted
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Be adopted, but first to Rules
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Rules
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor