+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Rules
- Reported be adopted, but first to Rules
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- To Government Organization then Rules
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Be adopted
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor