+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Be adopted
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Be adopted, but first to Rules
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- To House Roads and Transportation
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Rules
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor