+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- Communicated to Senate
On April 1, 2017 in the House:
- Be adopted
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Be adopted, but first to Rules
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- To House Roads and Transportation
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Rules
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor