+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Senate receded and adopted (Voice vote)
- House Message received
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
- Immediate consideration
- House received Senate message
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- On Unfinished Business
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported be adopted, with amendments and title amendment
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Daily Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Daily Calendar
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- By substitute, be adopted
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor