+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
On February 29, 2020 in the House:
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- Communicated to Senate
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Be adopted
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- To House Rules
- By substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- To House Technology and Infrastructure
- Introduced in House
- To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
- Filed for introduction