+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Finance Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
- Judiciary Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
- Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 485)
- Read 3rd time
- Finance Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
- Judiciary Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 4/9/21 with right to amend
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported be adopted, with amendment and title amendment
- To Finance
- Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary then Finance
- To Judiciary
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 346)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment adopted (Roll No. 342)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- By substitute, be adopted
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, be adopted, but first to Judiciary
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Introduced in House
- To Finance then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (20)
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2021: Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 485)
March 31, 2021: Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 346)
March 30, 2021: Amendment adopted (Roll No. 342)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor