+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted
- Completed legislative action
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Be adopted
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor