+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Voice vote)
- House received Senate message
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted, with amendments and title amendment
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- By substitute, be adopted
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- Filed for introduction