+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted
- Communicated to House
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Reported by the Clerk
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Be adopted
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Introduced in House
- To Rules
- Filed for introduction