+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 14, 2015 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Committee reference dispensed
- Immediate consideration
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- Communicated to Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Be adopted
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- To House Rules
- With amendment, be adopted, but first to Rules
On February 28, 2015 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Rules
- Filed for introduction