+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Voice vote)
- House received Senate message
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Adopted by Senate (Voice vote)
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Immediate consideration
- Reported be adopted, with amendments and title amendment
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
- Reported by the Clerk
- On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Be adopted
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- To House Rules
- Be adopted, but first to Rules
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- To House Roads and Transportation
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Rules
- Filed for introduction