+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading to Judiciary
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
- Read 1st time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 263)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §30 - 1 - 25 - (New Code)