+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/16
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal #16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal #0
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 347)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 347)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Immediate consideration
- Read 1st time
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 200)
- Passed House (Roll No. 199)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
- Originating in House Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §11 - 21 - 32 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 21 - 77 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 347)
March 8, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 347)
February 25, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 200)
February 25, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 199)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor