+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 209)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- §49 - 4 - 725 - (Amended Code)