+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to calendar by Rules Committee
- Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
- On 2nd reading
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 124)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Do pass
- Originating in House Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §17 C- 5 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 5 - 2 a - (Amended Code)