+ − Actions (34)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 57, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/14
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/14 - House Journal #2840
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/14 - Senate Journal #58
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2808
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #54
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 43)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Immediate consideration
- Read 1st time
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 226)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §18 - 20 - 10 - (New Code)
- § 5 - 16 - 13 - (Amended Code)