+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Pensions
- To Pensions then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 27, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 243)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/27
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- To House Pensions and Retirement
- Introduced in House
- To Pensions and Retirement then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 5 - 10 A- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 1 - 7 - (Amended Code)