+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 112, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/16
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - Senate Journal #20
- To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal #17
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 628)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 323)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 151)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- § 6 B- 2 - 4 - (Amended Code)