+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 75, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - House Journal #0
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/5/20
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - Senate Journal #151
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 2/28/20 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 2/28/20
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/28/20 - Senate Journal #16
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 175)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- On 1st reading
- Read 1st time
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Pensions
- To Pensions
- Introduced in Senate
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 77)
- Read 3rd time
- Placed at foot of all bills
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Do pass
- Originating in House Pensions and Retirement
+ − Statute Amended
- § 8 - 22 - 25 a - (Amended Code)