+ − Actions (40)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 80, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/14
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2840
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #57
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2808
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #53
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 41)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 472)
- House reconsidered its action
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 494)
- Completed legislative action
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- On 3rd reading
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, with amendment
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 151)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §16 - 29 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 29 - 1 - (Amended Code)