+ − Actions (8)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - House Journal #2839
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - Senate Journal #56
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §18 - 3 - 9 c - (New Code)
- §27 - 1 A- 12 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 11)
March 6, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 19)
February 20, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 117)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor