+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/15/18
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal #463
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/15/18 - Senate Journal #455
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 359)
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Floor Title amendment adopted
- Judiciary Title amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 323)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 156)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Postponed on 1st reading, Special Calendar, until 2/15/18
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- § 6 B- 2 B- 1 - (Amended Code)
- § 6 B- 2 B- 2 - (Amended Code)
- § 6 B- 2 B- 4 - (Amended Code)
- § 6 B- 2 B- 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 323)
February 19, 2018: Passed House (Roll No. 156)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor