+ − Actions (38)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 168, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/14
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/17/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal #2839
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal #55
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal #2796
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal #39
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 15)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Energy, Industry and Mining
- Introduced in Senate
- To Energy, Industry and Mining then Finance
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 214)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- To House Energy
- Introduced in House
- To Energy then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §11 - 13BB- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 13BB- 14 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 15)
February 26, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 214)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor