+ − Actions (49)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/31/14
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/14
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/13/14 - House Journal #2525
- Vetoed by Governor 3/13/14 - House Journal #2527
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 3/13/14 - Senate Journal #30
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- House reconsidered its action
- Reported by the Clerk
- House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 500)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 3)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #53
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2807
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - Senate Journal #57
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal #2840
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor 3/13/14
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/13/14 - Senate Journal #15
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/13/14
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 12)
- Completed legislative action
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 110)
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §61 - 2 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 2 - 28 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 14, 2014: Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 3)
March 4, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 12)
February 19, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 110)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor