+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/22
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/22
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 604)
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal #472
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal #496
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal #0
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 449)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
- Immediate consideration
- Read 1st time
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 334)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §47 - 19 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §60 A- 4 - 403 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2022: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 449)
March 2, 2022: Passed House (Roll No. 334)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor