+ − Actions (34)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 185, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/7/14 - House Journal #1991
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/7/14
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/7/14 - Senate Journal #303
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/6/14 - House Journal #1474
- To Governor 3/6/14
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/6/14 - Senate Journal #2
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 14)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Communicated to House
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Committee reference dispensed
- Introduced in Senate
- Immediate consideration
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 112)
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 111)
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- 2nd reference dispensed
- By substitute, do pass
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
- Introduced in House
- To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §15 - 1 G- 10 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 14)
February 20, 2014: Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 111)
February 20, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 112)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor