+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/21/18
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 544)
- Communicated to Senate
- House received Senate message
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal #459
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal #463
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate reconsidered title amendment (Voice vote)
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 437)
- Read 3rd time
- Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Committee Amendment Reported
- On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
- Having been read 1st time 3/7/18
- Immediate consideration
- Read 2nd time
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Judiciary
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 165)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services
- Introduced in House
- To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 8 - 15 - 17 - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 15 - 20 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2018: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 437)
February 20, 2018: Passed House (Roll No. 165)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor