+ − Actions (40)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14
- To Governor 3/28/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2840
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #57
- To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #51
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2806
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 370)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 20)
- Read 3rd time
- Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/14
- Deferred until foot of 1st reading
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 1st reading
- Read 1st time
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 157)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Do pass
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Introduced in House
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §15 - 2 - 5 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2014: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 20)
February 25, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 157)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor