+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calender
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- By substitute, do pass
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- §20 - 2 B- 7 - (Amended Code)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor