+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 29, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/2118
- Approved by Governor 3/21/18
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 539)
- Communicated to Senate
- House received Senate message
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal #459
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal #462
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 455)
- Read 3rd time
- Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
- Unanimous consent to amend
- Deferred until foot of 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Immediate consideration
- Read 1st time
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 244)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- §61 - 12 - 10 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 455)
February 28, 2018: Passed House (Roll No. 244)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor