+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 332)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 27, 2016 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 20, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- To House Roads and Transportation
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- §17 - 24 A- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §17 - 24 A- 6 a - (New Code)
- §17 - 24 A- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §17 A- 4 - 10 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
March 2, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 332)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor