+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/22/18
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/16/18
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal #462
- To Governor 3/16/18 - Senate Journal #456
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/16/18 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 394)
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 386)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 28)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Do pass
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 28 - 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2018: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 386)
January 29, 2018: Passed House (Roll No. 28)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor