+ − Actions (36)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 9, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/14
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/17/14
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - Senate Journal #55
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - House Journal #2839
- To Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal #2795
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal #37
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 6)
- Completed legislative action
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 103)
- Passed House (Roll No. 102)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Do pass
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Introduced in House
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 6)
March 4, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
February 19, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 103)
February 19, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 102)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor