+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 296, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/20
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported by clerk
- Deferred until foot of 3rd
- Committee Amendment Reported
- Substitute amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 574)
- Gov Org Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
- Sypolt Title amendment adopted
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 760)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 625)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
- To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal #580
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal #586
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal #0
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/20
- Deferred until foot of 3rd
- On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to calendar by Rules Committee
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 338)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
- Introduced in House
- To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (24)
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- §15 A- 9 - 1 - (New Code)
- §15 A- 9 - 2 - (New Code)
- §15 A- 9 - 3 - (New Code)
- §15 A- 9 - 4 - (New Code)
- §15 A- 9 - 5 - (New Code)
- §15 A- 9 - 6 - (New Code)
- §15 A- 9 - 7 - (New Code)
- §15 A- 9 - 8 - (New Code)