+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 2/25/16 - Senate Journal #15
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/25/16 - House Journal #785
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/25/16
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 2/24/16
- To Governor 2/24/16 - House Journal #734
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/24/16 - Senate Journal #11
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 169)
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 63)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Introduced in House
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- §11 - 8 - 6 a - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 16 I- 1 - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 I- 2 - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 I- 3 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 169)
February 20, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 120)
February 11, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 63)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor