+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calender
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/27/18
- Placed at foot of bills on 2nd Reading
- Placed on Special Calender
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calender
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- To House Political Subdivisions
- Introduced in House
- To Political Subdivisions then Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Statute Amended
- § 8 - 1 - 5 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor