+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 20, 2016 in the House:
- Became law without Governor's signature
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/18/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Became law without Governor's signature 3/20/16 - Senate Journal #21
- To Governor 3/18/16 - Senate Journal #9
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/18/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 478)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 478)
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 630)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 631)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
- Having been read 1st time 3/10/16
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass
- Motion
- Rereferred to Finance on 2nd reading
- Read 1st time
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 132)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 133)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Introduced in House
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 478)
March 12, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 631)
March 12, 2016: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 478)
February 22, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 133)
February 22, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 132)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor